Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Pardaillan de Gondrin d’Autin

Deceased

Bishop of Langres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1692¹Born
29 Mar 172432.2SelectedBishop of Langres, France
20 Nov 172432.8ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
27 Dec 172432.9Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
2 Nov 173341.8DiedBishop of Langres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Pardaillan de Gondrin d’Autin
Bishop Pierre de Pardaillan de Gondrin d’Autin (born 1692, died ) Bishop of Langres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017