Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-César Rousseau de La Parisière

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1667BornPoitiers
11 Jul 171043.1SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
1 Dec 171043.5ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
8 Feb 171143.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes, France
15 Nov 173669.5DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

MicroData Summary for Jules-César Rousseau de La Parisière:
Bishop Jules-César Rousseau de La Parisière (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015