Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Réné-François de Beauvau du Rivau

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1664BornRivau (Poitou)
18 Apr 170136.4AppointedBishop of Bayonne, France
17 Jul 170136.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
23 Apr 170742.4SelectedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
7 Nov 170743.0ResignedBishop of Bayonne, France
19 Dec 170743.1ConfirmedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
26 May 170843.5InstalledBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
20 May 171348.5ResignedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
27 Jul 171348.7SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
11 Dec 171349.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
28 May 172156.5AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
4 Aug 173974.7DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Réné-François de Beauvau du Rivau:
Archbishop Réné-François de Beauvau du Rivau (born , died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 112, and Page 280
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 378, and Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015