Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophe-Louis Turpin de Crissé de Sanzay

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1670Born
15 Aug 171140.9SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
1 Jun 171241.7ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
7 Aug 171241.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
26 Oct 172353.1SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
27 Sep 172454.0ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
29 Mar 174675.5DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Christophe-Louis Turpin de Crissé de Sanzay:
Bishop Christophe-Louis Turpin de Crissé de Sanzay (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

  • a bishop for 33.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 279, and Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013