Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ennemond-Flodoard Moret de Bourchenu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1663Born
19 May 171451.4SelectedBishop of Vence, France
19 Nov 171451.9ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
6 Jan 171552.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
23 Apr 172865.3ResignedBishop of Vence, France
11 Jan 174481.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Vence, France

MicroData Summary for Ennemond-Flodoard Moret de Bourchenu:
Bishop Ennemond-Flodoard Moret de Bourchenu (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vence

  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 407

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013