Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Firmin Trudaine

Deceased

Bishop of Senlis, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1679Born
19 May 171435.3SelectedBishop of Senlis, France
20 Aug 171435.6ConfirmedBishop of Senlis, France
25 Nov 171435.8Ordained BishopBishop of Senlis, France
4 Jan 175474.9DiedBishop of Senlis, France

MicroData Summary for François-Firmin Trudaine
Bishop François-Firmin Trudaine (born , died ) Bishop of Senlis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmiens

  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018