Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-François de Châteauneuf de Rochebonne

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1671Born
24 Dec 170736.9SelectedBishop of Noyon, France
26 Mar 170837.2ConfirmedBishop of Noyon, France
29 Jul 170837.5Ordained BishopBishop of Noyon, France
25 Jul 173160.5SelectedArchbishop of Lyon, France
19 Nov 173160.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon, France
28 Feb 174069.1DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François de Châteauneuf de Rochebonne
Archbishop Charles-François de Châteauneuf de Rochebonne (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForez

  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 268
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018