Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Paul de Neufville de Villeroy

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1677BornVersailles
16 Aug 171436.9SelectedArchbishop of Lyon, France
1 Oct 171437.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon, France
30 Nov 171437.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
6 Feb 173153.3DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for François-Paul de Neufville de Villeroy:
Archbishop François-Paul de Neufville de Villeroy (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015