Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre de Chevriers de Saint-Mauris

Deceased

Bishop of Saintes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1653Born
15 Aug 170248.6SelectedBishop of Saintes, France
20 Nov 170248.8ConfirmedBishop of Saintes, France
25 Mar 170349.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saintes, France
25 Dec 171056.9DiedBishop of Saintes, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre de Chevriers de Saint-Mauris
Bishop Alexandre de Chevriers de Saint-Mauris (born , died ) Bishop of Saintes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMâcon

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 343
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018