Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Crussol d’Uzès

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1702BornMontmaur
27 Jun 173432.4SelectedBishop of Blois, France
17 Nov 173432.8ConfirmedBishop of Blois, France
9 Jan 173532.9Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
15 Aug 175351.5SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
26 Sep 175351.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
30 May 175856.3DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for François de Crussol d’Uzès:
Archbishop François de Crussol d’Uzès (born , died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2/b: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 27 May 2015