Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Sébastien de Barral

Deceased

Bishop of Castres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1710Born
24 Jun 175241.6SelectedBishop of Castres, France
27 Nov 175242.1ConfirmedBishop of Castres, France
17 Dec 175242.1Ordained BishopBishop of Castres, France
16 Jul 177362.7DiedBishop of Castres, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Sébastien de Barral
Bishop Jean-Sébastien de Barral (born , died ) Bishop of Castres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrenoble

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 154
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,752, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast