Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Rolin de Morel de Mons

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viviers (Aps), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1715Born
9 Apr 174832.9SelectedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
16 Sep 174833.4ConfirmedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
6 Oct 174833.4Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
29 May 177863.1ResignedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
19 Sep 178368.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Viviers (Aps), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Rolin de Morel de Mons
Bishop Joseph Rolin de Morel de Mons (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viviers (Aps)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix

  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 444

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast