Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Joseph de Méallet de Fargues

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Claude


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1708BornSaint-Flour
15 Jun 173728.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 174133.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
22 Jan 174233.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
5 Aug 174234.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
8 Dec 174234.3InstalledBishop of Saint-Claude, France
19 Mar 178576.6DiedBishop of Saint-Claude, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Joseph de Méallet de Fargues:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Joseph de Méallet de Fargues (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Claude

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015