Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Gaspard-Alexis de Plan des Augiers

Deceased

Bishop of Die, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1709³Born
23 Sep 174132.2SelectedBishop of Die, France
20 Dec 174132.4ConfirmedBishop of Die, France
24 Feb 174232.6Ordained BishopBishop of Die, France
16 Jan 179484.5DiedBishop of Die, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges-Gaspard-Alexis de Plan des Augiers
Bishop Georges-Gaspard-Alexis de Plan des Augiers (born , died ) Bishop of Die

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDigne

  • a bishop for 51.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 196
  • d: MW, 26 Sep 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018