Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Marie de Quélen

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1703¹BornCommana
4 Jul 175451.5SelectedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
16 Dec 175451.9ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
19 Jan 175552.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
21 Apr 177774.3DiedTitular Bishop of Bethleem

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Marie de Quélen:
Bishop Charles-Marie de Quélen (born 1703, died ) Titular Bishop of Bethleem

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015