Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand-Jean-Baptiste-René du Guesclin

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1703BornRennes
20 Aug 174137.9SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
18 Sep 174138.0ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
15 Oct 174138.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
2 Aug 176662.9DiedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Bertrand-Jean-Baptiste-René du Guesclin:
Bishop Bertrand-Jean-Baptiste-René du Guesclin (born , died ) Bishop of Cahors

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015