Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Jules-César de Rochechouard-Montigny

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1698Born
28 Aug 173335.4SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
15 Feb 173435.9ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
21 Mar 173436.0Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
9 Aug 175355.4SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
26 Nov 175355.7ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
27 Dec 177678.8RetiredBishop of Bayeux, France
24 Jan 178182.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bayeux, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Jules-César de Rochechouard-Montigny
Bishop Pierre-Jules-César de Rochechouard-Montigny (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontigny

  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 113, and Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018