Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Fitz-James

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1709BornSaint-Germain-en-Laye
31 Dec 173829.5SelectedBishop of Soissons, France
23 Feb 173929.7ConfirmedBishop of Soissons, France
31 May 173929.9Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
19 Jul 176455.1DiedBishop of Soissons, France

MicroData Summary for François de Fitz-James:
Bishop François de Fitz-James (born , died ) Bishop of Soissons

  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015