Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Grimaldi d’Antibes

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1705¹BornCagnes
11 Sep 174641.6SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
19 Dec 174641.9ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
22 Jan 174742.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
10 Mar 177065.1DiedBishop of Rodez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Grimaldi d’Antibes:
Bishop Charles de Grimaldi d’Antibes (born 1705, died ) Bishop of Rodez

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016