Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aymard-Chrétien-François-Michel de Nicolay

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1721Born
21 Apr 175432.8SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
20 May 175432.9ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
16 Jun 175432.9Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
9 Dec 176948.4DiedBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Aymard-Chrétien-François-Michel de Nicolay
Bishop Aymard-Chrétien-François-Michel de Nicolay (born , died ) Bishop of Verdun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 443
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018