Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul Cardinal d’Albert de Luynes

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens

Cardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1703BornVersailles
17 Feb 172926.1SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
17 Aug 172926.6ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
25 Sep 172926.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux, France
9 Aug 175350.5SelectedArchbishop of Sens, France
21 Sep 175350.7ResignedBishop of Bayeux, France
26 Nov 175350.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens, France
5 Apr 175653.2Elevated to Cardinal
2 Aug 175855.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
21 Jan 178885.0DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Paul d’Albert de Luynes:
Paul Cardinal d’Albert de Luynes (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens

  • a bishop for 58.3 years
  • a cardinal for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015