Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude de Rouvroy de Saint-Simon

Deceased

Bishop of Metz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1695BornParis
26 Jul 173135.8SelectedBishop of Noyon, France
7 May 173236.6ConfirmedBishop of Noyon, France
15 Jun 173236.7Ordained BishopBishop of Noyon, France
28 Aug 173337.9SelectedBishop of Metz, France
15 Feb 173438.4ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
29 Feb 176064.4DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Claude de Rouvroy de Saint-Simon:
Bishop Claude de Rouvroy de Saint-Simon (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013