Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Drouas de Boussey

Deceased

Bishop of Toul, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1712Born
17 Feb 175441.3SelectedBishop of Toul, France
22 Apr 175441.5ConfirmedBishop of Toul, France
12 May 175441.6Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
21 Oct 177361.0DiedBishop of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Claude Drouas de Boussey
Bishop Claude Drouas de Boussey (born , died ) Bishop of Toul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViteaux

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 422

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast