Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François-SIméon de Saint-Simon de Vermandois de Rouvroy de Sandricourt

Deceased

Bishop of Agde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1727BornParis
8 Mar 175931.9SelectedBishop of Agde, France
9 Apr 175932.0ConfirmedBishop of Agde, France
6 May 175932.1Ordained BishopBishop of Agde, France
26 Jul 179467.3DiedBishop of Agde, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François-SIméon de Saint-Simon de Vermandois de Rouvroy de Sandricourt:
Bishop Charles-François-SIméon de Saint-Simon de Vermandois de Rouvroy de Sandricourt (born , died ) Bishop of Agde

  • a bishop for 35.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 22 Sep 2013