Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Siffrein Cardinal Maury

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1746BornValreás, France
1769²22.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 179245.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
1 May 179245.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
21 Feb 179447.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
21 Feb 179447.6Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 179448.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
24 Mar 181669.7ResignedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
10 May 181770.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Siffrein Maury
Jean-Siffrein Cardinal Maury (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
  • a cardinal for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1794
  • r: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 62
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 295, and Page 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016