Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dominique Cardinal de La Rochefoucauld

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1712BornSaint-Chély-d'Apcher
1 May 174734.5SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
29 May 174734.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
29 Jun 174734.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Albi, France
25 Apr 175946.5SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
30 Apr 175946.5ResignedArchbishop of Albi, France
2 Jun 175946.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
1 Jun 177865.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 180087.9DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Dominique de La Rochefoucauld:
Dominique Cardinal de La Rochefoucauld (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a bishop for 53.2 years
  • a cardinal for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1778
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 73, and Page 359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015