Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel-Florent de Choiseul-Beaupré

Deceased

Bishop of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1685³BornDinant, Belgium
18 May 171630.9SelectedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
8 Jun 171833.0ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
17 Jul 171833.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
26 Oct 172338.4SelectedBishop of Mende, France
9 Jun 172439.0ResignedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
11 Sep 172439.2ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
7 Jul 176782.0DiedBishop of Mende, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel-Florent de Choiseul-Beaupré:
Bishop Gabriel-Florent de Choiseul-Beaupré (born Jun 1685, died ) Bishop of Mende

  • a bishop for 48.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 268, and Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015