Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Antoine de Choiseul-Beaupré

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1697BornDaillecourt
Dec 1722³25.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 173335.8SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
18 Dec 173336.1ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
7 Mar 173436.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
2 Oct 176365.9DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude-Antoine de Choiseul-Beaupré:
Bishop Claude-Antoine de Choiseul-Beaupré (born , died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 155
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015