Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Léopold-Charles de Choiseul-Stainville

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1724BornLunéville
14 May 175833.4SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
2 Oct 175833.8ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
29 Oct 175833.8Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
Apr 175934.3SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
30 Apr 175934.3ResignedBishop of Evreux, France
28 May 175934.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
13 May 176439.4SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
5 Jul 176439.5ResignedArchbishop of Albi, France
9 Jul 176439.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
10 Sep 177449.7DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Léopold-Charles de Choiseul-Stainville:
Archbishop Léopold-Charles de Choiseul-Stainville (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 73, and Page 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015