Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Valbelle de Tourves

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Omer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1664BornAix en Provence
1 Nov 170844.6SelectedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
19 Feb 171045.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
6 Apr 171046.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
17 Nov 172763.7DiedBishop of Saint-Omer, France

MicroData Summary for François de Valbelle de Tourves:
Bishop François de Valbelle de Tourves (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Omer

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015