Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François de Montmorency-Laval

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1668¹BornChartres
13 Feb 171345.1AppointedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
23 Apr 171345.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
26 Aug 171345.6DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-François de Montmorency-Laval:
Bishop Charles-François de Montmorency-Laval (born 1668, died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015