Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Sabatier

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1654BornVabres
15 Aug 170651.8SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
11 Apr 170752.4ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
15 May 170752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
20 Jan 173378.2DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Sabatier:
Bishop Pierre de Sabatier (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013