Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Amédée de Grégoire de Saint-Sauveur

Deceased

Bishop of Bazas, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1709Born
19 Jun 174636.9SelectedBishop of Bazas, France
19 Sep 174637.2ConfirmedBishop of Bazas, France
16 Oct 174637.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bazas, France
16 Jan 179282.5DiedBishop of Bazas, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Amédée de Grégoire de Saint-Sauveur
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Amédée de Grégoire de Saint-Sauveur (born , died ) Bishop of Bazas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIspagnac

  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 433

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018