Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Amédée de Broglie

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1710BornArles
7 Nov 175342.9SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
11 Feb 175443.1ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
3 Mar 175443.2Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
19 Apr 178473.3DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Amédée de Broglie:
Bishop Joseph-Amédée de Broglie (born , died ) Bishop of Angoulême

  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015