Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Gilbert de May de Termont

Deceased

Bishop of Blois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1712¹BornPérigueux
15 Aug 175341.6SelectedBishop of Blois, France
10 Dec 175341.9ConfirmedBishop of Blois, France
30 Dec 175341.9Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
22 Jul 177664.5DiedBishop of Blois, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Gilbert de May de Termont:
Bishop Charles-Gilbert de May de Termont (born 1712, died ) Bishop of Blois

  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016