Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Chapelle de Jumilhac de Cubjac

Deceased

Bishop of Lectoure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1713¹BornPérigord
29 Jun 176047.4SelectedBishop of Lectoure, France
15 Dec 176047.9ConfirmedBishop of Lectoure, France
4 Jan 176148.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lectoure, France
26 Jun 177259.4DiedBishop of Lectoure, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Chapelle de Jumilhac de Cubjac:
Bishop Pierre Chapelle de Jumilhac de Cubjac (born 1713, died ) Bishop of Lectoure

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Nov 2015