Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Gaspard-Gilbert de Chabannas

Deceased

Bishop of Agen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1702¹BornRiom
8 Oct 173533.7SelectedBishop of Agen, France
19 Dec 173533.9ConfirmedBishop of Agen, France
29 Jan 173634.0Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
26 Jul 176765.5DiedBishop of Agen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Gaspard-Gilbert de Chabannas:
Bishop Jean-Gaspard-Gilbert de Chabannas (born 1702, died ) Bishop of Agen

  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015