Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume d’Hugues de la Motte

Deceased

Archbishop of Vienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1687BornChâteau de la Motte
17 Sep 174053.1SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
5 Dec 174053.3ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
5 Mar 174153.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
9 Jun 174153.9InstalledBishop of Nevers, France
4 Apr 175163.7AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
2 Jul 175163.9ResignedBishop of Nevers, France
19 Jul 175164.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Vienne, France
30 Dec 175164.4InstalledArchbishop of Vienne, France
7 Jan 177486.4DiedArchbishop of Vienne, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume d’Hugues de la Motte:
Archbishop Guillaume d’Hugues de la Motte (born , died ) Archbishop of Vienne

  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 312, and Page 441

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015