Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Cortois de Quincey

Deceased

Bishop of Belley, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1714¹Born
4 Apr 175137.2SelectedBishop of Belley, France
19 Jul 175137.5ConfirmedBishop of Belley, France
22 Aug 175137.6Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
14 Jan 179177.0DiedBishop of Belley, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Cortois de Quincey
Bishop Gabriel Cortois de Quincey (born 1714, died ) Bishop of Belley

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon

  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018