Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François-Alexandre Cardevac de Gouy d’Havrincourt

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1699BornBonchy
8 Sep 174344.4SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
16 Dec 174344.7ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
9 Feb 174444.8Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
1 Mar 178383.9DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François-Alexandre Cardevac de Gouy d’Havrincourt:
Bishop Charles-François-Alexandre Cardevac de Gouy d’Havrincourt (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015