Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armand Bazin de Bezons

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1701BornParis
1725¹23.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 173028.9SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
18 Dec 173029.7ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
14 Jan 173129.7Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
11 May 177877.1DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Armand Bazin de Bezons:
Bishop Armand Bazin de Bezons (born , died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 47.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015