Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Lastic

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1709BornSieuzac
14 Oct 173930.7AppointedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
9 Oct 174031.7Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
16 Nov 176354.8SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
19 Dec 176354.9ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
23 Dec 176354.9DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Lastic:
Bishop Antoine de Lastic (died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne

  • a bishop for 23.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015