Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henri-Pons Cardinal de Thiard de Bissy

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1657Born
29 Mar 168729.8SelectedBishop of Toul, France
10 Mar 169234.7ConfirmedBishop of Toul, France
24 Aug 169235.2Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
10 May 170446.9SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
9 Feb 170547.7ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
29 May 171558.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 172164.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
14 Aug 173073.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
26 Jul 173780.1DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Pons de Thiard de Bissy (VIAF: 19770855)
Henri-Pons Cardinal de Thiard de Bissy (born , died ) Bishop of Meaux

EventPlace
Birth PlacePierre-de-Bresse

  • a bishop for 44.9 years
  • a cardinal for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 263, and Page 394
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 28
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 May 1715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Jan 2018