Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert-Gaspard de Montmorin de Saint-Hérem de La Chassaigne

Deceased

Bishop of Langres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1691BornLansac
20 Jan 172331.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Aire, France
20 Jan 172331.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
7 Nov 172332.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
7 Nov 172332.3SucceededBishop of Aire, France
23 May 173442.8SelectedBishop of Langres, France
1 Dec 173443.4ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
19 May 177078.8DiedBishop of Langres, France

MicroData Summary for Gilbert-Gaspard de Montmorin de Saint-Hérem de La Chassaigne:
Bishop Gilbert-Gaspard de Montmorin de Saint-Hérem de La Chassaigne (born , died ) Bishop of Langres

  • a bishop for 46.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 70, and Page 356
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015