Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri-Marie-Bernardin de Rosset de Ceilhes de Fleury

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1718BornFleury
17 Dec 174022.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Sep 174224.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Dec 175032.3SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
17 May 175132.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
20 Jun 175132.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tours, France
24 Sep 177456.0SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
2 Mar 177556.5ResignedArchbishop of Tours, France
3 Apr 177556.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
22 Jan 178162.4DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marie-Bernardin de Rosset de Ceilhes de Fleury:
Archbishop Henri-Marie-Bernardin de Rosset de Ceilhes de Fleury (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 143, and Page 422

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015