Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Augustin-Bernardin de Rosset de Rocozel de Fleury

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1717BornFleury
19 Jun 174629.1SelectedBishop of Chartres, France
19 Sep 174629.3ConfirmedBishop of Chartres, France
16 Oct 174629.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
13 Jan 178062.6DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Augustin-Bernardin de Rosset de Rocozel de Fleury:
Bishop Pierre-Augustin-Bernardin de Rosset de Rocozel de Fleury (born , died ) Bishop of Chartres

  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015