Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph de Saint-André de Marnays de Vercel

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1713¹BornParis
21 May 175239.3SelectedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
25 Sep 175239.7ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
22 Oct 175239.8Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
28 Sep 177966.7DiedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph de Saint-André de Marnays de Vercel:
Bishop Joseph de Saint-André de Marnays de Vercel (born 1713, died ) Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015