Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armand-Louis Bonnin de Chalucet

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1641¹BornNantes
1675¹34.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 168443.4SelectedBishop of Toulon, France
4 Feb 169251.0ConfirmedBishop of Toulon, France
25 Mar 169251.2Ordained BishopBishop of Toulon, France
10 Jul 171271.5DiedBishop of Toulon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Armand-Louis Bonnin de Chalucet:
Bishop Armand-Louis Bonnin de Chalucet (born 1641, died ) Bishop of Toulon

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 377
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015