Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-François Beauvau de Rivau

Deceased

Bishop of Sarlat


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹BornTours
15 Oct 169250.7AppointedBishop of Sarlat, France
25 Jan 169351.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sarlat, France
23 Oct 170159.8DiedBishop of Sarlat, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-François Beauvau de Rivau:
Bishop Pierre-François Beauvau de Rivau (born 1642, died ) Bishop of Sarlat

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 345
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015