Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel de Cosnac

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1626³Born
24 Jun 165428.0SelectedBishop of Valence and Die, France
21 Apr 165528.8ConfirmedBishop of Valence and Die, France
24 Oct 165529.3Ordained BishopBishop of Valence and Die, France
19 Jan 168760.6SelectedArchbishop of Aix, France
169366.5ResignedBishop of Valence, France
9 Nov 169367.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix, France
18 Jan 170881.6DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel de Cosnac
Archbishop Daniel de Cosnac (born Jun 1626, died ) Archbishop of Aix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosnac

  • a bishop for 52.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 92
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 357
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast